EP4358333 - CONVERSION POWER SUPPLY AND AUTONOMOUS ELECTRIC ENERGY REPLENISHMENT METHOD FOR ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sungrow Power Supply Co., Ltd. No.1699 Xiyou Rd. New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Jianjie Hefei / CN | 02 /
CAO, Xiaohui Hefei / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Fanglin Hefei / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Zihao Hefei / CN | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23186531.2 | 19.07.2023 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | CN202211266028 | 17.10.2022 Original published format: CN202211266028 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4358333 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4358333 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/08, H02J7/00, H02J7/02, H02J7/34 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H02J7/0068 (EP);
H02J7/00306 (CN,US);
H02J1/082 (EP);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
H02J7/0016 (CN);
H02J7/02 (EP);
H02J7/06 (CN);
H02J7/34 (EP);
H02J9/061 (CN);
H02M1/088 (CN);
H02M3/003 (CN);
H02M3/005 (CN);
H02M3/155 (US);
H02M3/1582 (CN);
H02M3/33576 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMRICHTERGESTÜTZTE STROMVERSORGUNG UND AUTONOMES VERFAHREN ZUM NACHLADEN ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE FÜR EIN ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM | [2024/17] | English: | CONVERSION POWER SUPPLY AND AUTONOMOUS ELECTRIC ENERGY REPLENISHMENT METHOD FOR ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM | [2024/17] | French: | ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE DE CONVERSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉAPPROVISIONNEMENT EN ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE AUTONOME POUR SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2024/17] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010315043 (CHAU HAK HON [HK]); | [Y]CN216252245U (UNIV SHAANXI SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY ) |