EP4279172 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BIOFUEL BY CONVERTING A POLYMERIC MATERIAL MELT MIXED WITH SUPERCRITAL WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mura Technology Limited Level 4 Ldn:W 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7EE / GB | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMPHREYS, Leonard James Roseville Chase, NSW 2069 / AU | 02 /
ROWLANDS, William Neil Alexandria, NSW 2015 / AU | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 23186720.1 | 14.12.2017 | [2023/47] | Priority number, date | AU20160905177 | 14.12.2016 Original published format: AU 2016905177 | [2023/47] | Previously filed application, date | WO2017AU00278 | 14.12.2017 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4279172 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4279172 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/00, C10G1/10, C10L1/02, C10L1/04, C10G1/06, C10G1/08, B01J19/20, B01J19/24, B01J3/02 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
C10G1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/20 (EP,KR);
B01J19/242 (EP,KR);
B01J19/2445 (EP,KR);
B01J3/008 (EP,KR);
B01J3/02 (EP,KR);
C10G1/002 (US);
C10G1/065 (EP);
C10G1/083 (EP);
C10G11/02 (KR);
C10G19/00 (KR);
C10G31/08 (KR);
C10L1/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2300/1003 (US);
C10G2300/202 (US);
C10G2300/301 (US);
C10G2300/4006 (KR);
C10G2300/4012 (KR);
C10G2300/805 (US);
C10G2400/28 (US);
C10L2200/0461 (US);
C10L2250/04 (US);
C10L2290/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | B01J3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIOKRAFTSTOFF DURCH UMWANDLUNG EINER MIT ÜBERKRITISCHEM WASSER GEMISCHTEN KUNSTSTOFFMATERIALSCHMELZE | [2023/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BIOFUEL BY CONVERTING A POLYMERIC MATERIAL MELT MIXED WITH SUPERCRITAL WATER | [2023/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BIOCARBURANT PAR CONVERSION D'UN MATERIAU POLYMÈRE FONDU MÉLANGÉ À DE L'EAU SUPERCRITIQUE | [2023/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17881334.1 / EP3555231 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6504068 (MATSUBARA WATARU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * column 6, line 48 - column 8, line 16 * * claims 1-12 * * tables 1,2 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US8057666 (ALLAN GRAHAM [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 6, lines 41-49,52-59 * * column 9, lines 35-42 * * column 10, lines 9-48 ** figure 6 *; | [IY]US2016114307 (DOWNIE ROBERT [AU], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014] - [0037] - [0048] - [0056] - [0062] - [0064] - [0067] - [0069] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0079] , [0081] , [0085] , [0086] , [0101] - [0108] - [0110] - [0112] - [0116] , [0118] , [0179] - [0189] * * paragraphs [0190] - [0192] - [0197] , [0206] , [0210] , [0211] , [0214] - [0218] - [0225] - [0227] - [0281] - [0289] * * paragraphs [0292] , [0293] , [0317] - [0320] * * figure 1; claims 1, 27 * [Y] 1-17; | [E]EP3555231 (MURA TECH LIMITED [GB]) [E] 1-17 * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0106] * * figures 1,2,9 * |