EP4317903 - WEAPON MOUNTING AND TURRET COMPRISING SUCH A WEAPON MOUNTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNDS France 13 Route de la Minière 78034 Versailles Cedex / FR | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/06] | For all designated states NEXTER Systems 13 Route de la Minière 78034 Versailles Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOURNIER, Benjamin 18023 BOURGES / FR | 02 /
POIRMEUR, Xavier 18023 BOURGES / FR | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23187022.1 | 21.07.2023 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | FR20220007957 | 03.08.2022 Original published format: FR 2207957 | [2024/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317903 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F41A27/08, F41A27/18, F41A27/30, F41G5/24 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
F41A27/08 (EP);
F41A27/18 (EP);
F41A27/30 (EP);
F41G5/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/37] |
Former [2024/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WAFFENHALTERUNG UND TURM MIT EINER SOLCHEN WAFFENHALTERUNG | [2024/06] | English: | WEAPON MOUNTING AND TURRET COMPRISING SUCH A WEAPON MOUNTING | [2024/06] | French: | MONTAGE D ARME ET TOURELLE COMPORTANT UN TEL MONTAGE D ARME | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/37] | 07.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3843258 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]FR2670878 (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 36; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]EP0664430 (GIAT IND SA [FR]) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 3; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2004134339 (URVOY EMILE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 39]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2004159229 (URVOY EMILE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0060] - [0065]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2017076388 (KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9* page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 18; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | FR2544065 | DE3328208 | US4838144 | US5703318 | EP1072857 | US2012266747 | FR3109815 |