EP4250204 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CALCULATING AND SHARING A USER OCCUPANCY STATUS RELATIVE TO USE OF MULTIMEDIA APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALE International 32 Avenue Kleber 92700 Colombes / FR | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLIVIER, François 67115 Plobsheim / FR | 02 /
HELBERT, Emmanuel 67140 Andlau / FR | 03 /
WARICHET, Sebastien 37270 Montlouis sur Loire / FR | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 17-21, rue Saint-Fiacre 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/39] | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 56, Bd Niels Bohr CS 52132 69603 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 23187113.8 | 19.07.2021 | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4250204 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4250204 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q10/10 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0631 (EP);
G06Q10/063114 (EP);
G06Q10/101 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | G06Q10/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2023/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ABLEITUNG DES TYPS EINES MULTIMEDIA-DATENSTROMS ZUR DARSTELLUNG DES VERBRAUCHS EINER MULTIMEDIA-ANWENDUNG | [2023/39] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CALCULATING AND SHARING A USER OCCUPANCY STATUS RELATIVE TO USE OF MULTIMEDIA APPLICATIONS | [2023/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉDUIRE LE TYPE DE FLUX DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIA REPRÉSENTATIF DE LA CONSOMMATION D'UNE APPLICATION MULTIMÉDIA | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 05.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21306017.1 / EP4123526 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019174319 (BACKHOLM ARI [US], et al) [I] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0173] , [0234] *; | [I]CN110197234B (UNIV SICHUAN) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0024] - [0028] *; | [I]CN113128626 (UNIV ANHUI NORMAL) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0061] * * abstract *; | [I] - PUNITHA V ET AL, "Traffic classification for efficient load balancing in server cluster using deep learning technique", THE JOURNAL OF SUPERCOMPUTING, SPRINGER US, NEW YORK, vol. 77, no. 8, doi:10.1007/S11227-020-03613-3, ISSN 0920-8542, (20210112), pages 8038 - 8062, (20210112), XP037510696 [I] 1-10 * Section 3.2 Section 3.3 Section 3.5 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11227-020-03613-3 | [A] - ZHOU HUIYI ET AL, "A Method of Improved CNN Traffic Classification", 2017 13TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY (CIS), IEEE, (20171215), doi:10.1109/CIS.2017.00046, pages 177 - 181, XP033318410 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIS.2017.00046 | [A] - ELSAYED MAHMOUD SAID ET AL, "A novel hybrid model for intrusion detection systems in SDNs based on CNN and a new regularization technique", JOURNAL OF NETWORK AND COMPUTER APPLICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 191, doi:10.1016/J.JNCA.2021.103160, ISSN 1084-8045, (20210709), (20210709), XP086760004 [A] 1-10 * Section 4.2 Our proposed models * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jnca.2021.103160 |