EP4361677 - RADAR SENSOR ARRANGEMENT AND MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUF Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Str. 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schindler, Mirko 42549 Velbert / DE | 02 /
Leib, Steffen 40885 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
Wehner, Philipp 45879 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23187491.8 | 25.07.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | DE202210128405 | 26.10.2022 Original published format: DE102022128405 | [2024/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361677 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/88, G01S13/34, G01S13/56, G01S13/58, E05B81/78, E05F15/73, G01S13/04, G01S13/42, // G01S7/41 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G01S13/88 (EP);
G01S13/04 (EP);
G01S13/426 (EP);
G01S13/56 (EP);
G01S13/583 (EP);
G01S7/412 (EP);
G01S7/415 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADARSENSORANORDNUNG UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2024/18] | English: | RADAR SENSOR ARRANGEMENT AND MOTOR VEHICLE | [2024/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE CAPTEUR RADAR ET VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000155171 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 4,7* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102016100064 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [XYI]DE102017202016 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 11 [I] 10,12; | [A]DE102019204654 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE SE & CO KG BAMBERG [DE]) [A] 13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015] *; | [XAI]DE102019214496 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE SE & CO KG BAMBERG [DE]) [X] 12,14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * [A] 9 [I] 13; | [YA] - Texas Instruments, "IWR6843AOP Single-Chip 60-to 64-GHz mmWave Sensor Antennas-On-Package (AOP) IWR6843AOP", (20220731), pages 1 - 81, URL: https://www.ti.com/lit/gpn/iwr6843aop, (20231107), XP093098670 [Y] 11 * page 1 * [A] 10 |