EP4273912 - DYNAMIC SHEATH CONTROL WITH EDGE RING LIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAM Research Corporation 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIESTER, Jacob, Lee Fremont, 94538 / US | 02 /
BLANK, Richard, M. Fremont, 94538 / US | 03 /
BAILEY, Curtis, W. Fremont, 95438 / US | 04 /
JANICKI, Michael., J. Fremont, 94538 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23187534.5 | 14.11.2019 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | US201816205028 | 29.11.2018 Original published format: US201816205028 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4273912 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4273912 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/458, C23C16/505, H01J37/32, C23C16/50, H01L21/687 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C23C16/4583 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/68742 (EP,CN);
C23C16/45544 (CN,US);
C23C16/4581 (CN);
C23C16/4585 (EP,CN,KR);
C23C16/50 (EP,CN);
C23C16/52 (CN);
H01J37/32082 (CN);
H01J37/32623 (EP);
H01J37/32642 (EP,CN);
H01J37/32715 (EP,CN,KR);
H01L21/68735 (EP,CN);
H01L21/68785 (EP);
H01L21/68792 (EP);
C23C16/505 (KR);
H01J2237/3321 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | H01L21/687 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE MANTELSTEUERUNG MIT RANDRINGHEBUNG | [2023/45] | English: | DYNAMIC SHEATH CONTROL WITH EDGE RING LIFT | [2023/45] | French: | COMMANDE DE GAINE DYNAMIQUE AVEC LEVÉE D'ANNEAU DE BORD | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 02.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19890740.4 / EP3887570 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003000647 (YUDOVSKY JOSEPH [US], et al); | [A]KR20080023569 (HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC [KR]); | [A]US2016211166 (YAN HAOQUAN [US], et al); | [A]US2017032987 (LEE HYUNG-JOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2018277416 (TAKAHASHI SHUICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2018334746 (BREILING PATRICK [US], et al) |