EP4324972 - WARP SIZING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsudakoma Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken 921-8650 / JP | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKU, Junichi Kanazawa-shi, 921-8650 / JP | 02 /
MUKAIDE, Mitsuki Kanazawa-shi, 921-8650 / JP | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23187909.9 | 26.07.2023 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | JP20220131259 | 19.08.2022 Original published format: JP 2022131259 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4324972 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D06B1/14, B65H49/00, // B65H71/00, D06B3/04 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
D06B1/145 (EP);
D06B3/09 (CN);
D06B23/20 (CN);
D06B3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2024/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHLICHTEN VON KETTFÄDEN | [2024/08] | English: | WARP SIZING APPARATUS | [2024/08] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENCOLLAGE DE CHAÎNE | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 25.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3145342 (SUCKER & FRANZ MUELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 4, first paragraph; page 11, first paragraph - page 13, last paragraph;; figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN201099754Y (YANCHENG HONGDA TEXTILE MACHIN [CN]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [IA]ITUA20164038 (T M T MANENTI S R L) [I] 1,2 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 20; page 5, line 1 - page 12, line 6 * [A] 3; | [A]EP3299503 (KARL MAYER ROTAL SRL [IT]) [A] 1-3* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2003096657 | JP2013002029 |