EP4385667 - CONCRETE VIBRATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation 13135 West Lisbon Road Brookfield, WI 53005 / US | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINKEBIGE, Carissa J. Lake Mills, WI 53551 / US | 02 /
GLANZER, Evan M. Milwaukee, WI 53207 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Joseph W. Waukesha, WI 53186 / US | 04 /
VAIDYA, Rohit Menomonee Falls, WI 53051 / US | 05 /
THUER, Erich G. Menomonee Falls, WI 53051 / US | 06 /
FLAHERTY, Katherine A. Brookfield, WI 53045 / US | 07 /
MARTINEZ, Gabriel 27085 Torreon / MX | 08 /
CHAMPAN-ALDRIDGE, Soren Z. Kenosha, WI 53143 / US | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 23187914.9 | 26.07.2023 | [2024/25] | Priority number, date | US202263392615P | 27.07.2022 Original published format: US 202263392615 P | US202263386733P | 09.12.2022 Original published format: US 202263386733 P | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4385667 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, H01M50/247, H01M50/256, H01M50/264, H02J7/00, H01M50/244, B25F5/02 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H02K11/215 (EP);
H02K11/30 (US);
E04G21/08 (EP);
H02P29/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETONVIBRATORSYSTEM | [2024/25] | English: | CONCRETE VIBRATOR SYSTEM | [2024/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VIBRATEUR DE BÉTON | [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014009857 (SUZUKI TOSHIYUKI [JP]); | [A]CN206530067U (HAITAI CONSTRUCTION CO LTD); | [XI]JP2019019530 (SUYAMA CONSTRUCTION CO LTD); | [A]JP2019206910 (KAJIMA CORP) |