EP4325187 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MATCHING COLOR AND/OR APPEARANCE OF A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalta Coating Systems GmbH Uferstrasse 90 4057 Basel / CH | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steenhoek, Larry Ellicott City, 21043 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23187963.6 | 26.07.2023 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | US202217815576 | 28.07.2022 Original published format: US202217815576 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325187 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/46, G01J3/50, G01N21/57 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
G01J3/463 (EP);
G01J3/46 (CN);
G01N21/57 (EP,US);
G01B11/00 (CN);
G01B11/24 (CN);
G01J3/504 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ANPASSUNG DER FARBE UND/ODER DES AUSSEHENS EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2024/08] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MATCHING COLOR AND/OR APPEARANCE OF A SURFACE | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE DE COULEUR ET/OU D'ASPECT D'UNE SURFACE | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 06.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0335192 (PACIFIC SCIENTIFIC CO [US]); | [I]US2013154830 (XU ZHILING [US], et al); | [I]US2021381896 (XU ZHILING [US], et al); | by applicant | US8441641 | US8909574 | US8929646 | US8999429 | US9080915 | US9292744 | US9677942 | US10928327 | US11062479 | US11080552 |