EP4292981 - BIOGENIC ACTIVATED CARBON AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbon Technology Holdings, LLC 16 West 46th Street, Floor 11 New York, NY 10036 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESPEN, Daniel J. Minneapolis / US | 02 /
MENNELL, James A. Dellwood / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/51] | Carridge, Andrew Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 23189073.2 | 07.05.2013 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US201261643741P | 07.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261643741 P | US201261721827P | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261721827 P | US201261737514P | 14.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261737514 P | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4292981 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/30, B01J20/20, C01B32/182 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B01J20/22 (EP,US);
B01J20/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/0225 (EP,US);
B01J20/0288 (EP,US);
B01J20/041 (EP,US);
B01J20/043 (EP,US);
B01J20/046 (EP,US);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/10 (EP,US);
B01J20/12 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/28009 (EP,US);
B01J20/28066 (EP,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/184 (EP,US);
C01B32/30 (US);
C01B32/336 (EP,US);
C01B32/39 (US);
C10B39/02 (US);
C10B53/02 (US);
C10B57/005 (US);
C10B57/10 (US);
B01J2220/485 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2023/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BIOGENE AKTIVKOHLE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/51] | English: | BIOGENIC ACTIVATED CARBON AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [2023/51] | French: | CHARBON ACTIF BIOGÈNE ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 19.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13787003.6 / EP2847126 | EP19207780.8 / EP3653570 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009272946 (LU WEN [US]) [X] 9-13,15,16 * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] - [0 80] , [ 137] * [I] 1-8,14; | [XI]US7623340 (SONG LULU [US], et al) [X] 9-13,15,16 * column 1, lines 11-15 *[I] 1-8,14; | [XI]CN102208598 (NINGBO INST MAT TECH & ENG CAS) [X] 9-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 25] - [0032] * [I] 1-8 |