EP4317795 - COOKING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Myeongsu 08592 Seoul / KR | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23189203.5 | 02.08.2023 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | KR20220096379 | 02.08.2022 Original published format: KR 20220096379 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4317795 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4317795 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/00, F24C15/32 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
F24C15/003 (EP,KR,US);
F24C15/08 (KR);
F24C15/02 (US);
F24C15/006 (KR);
F24C15/322 (KR);
F24C15/327 (EP,KR,US);
F24C7/006 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GARGERÄT | [2024/06] | English: | COOKING APPLIANCE | [2024/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0276458 (BUDERUS KUECHENTECHNIK [DE]); | [A]KR20070054992 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]EP2518413 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XY]US2018070757 (LEE HYUN JU [KR], et al); | [Y]EP3594573 (TEKA PORTUGAL S A [PT]) | by applicant | EP3080517 |