EP4257556 - PARTICLES WITH BIOZIDAL COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InstrAction GmbH Carl-Friedrich-Gauß-Ring 5 69124 Heidelberg / DE | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welter, Martin 69151 Neckargmünd / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Christian 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | 03 /
Lungfiel, Christian 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Fritz Black-IP Legal Arnoldstraße 8 85402 Kranzberg / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23189316.5 | 13.03.2020 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | DE201910106646 | 15.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019106646 | [2023/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4257556 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4257556 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/14, A01N25/34, A01N33/02, A01N61/00, B01D39/00, B01J20/32, B01J20/34, C02F1/28 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A01N25/10 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J20/3204 (EP,CN,KR);
C09D5/14 (CN,KR);
A01N25/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A01N33/04 (CN,KR);
A61L2/232 (CN,US);
B01D39/06 (EP,CN);
B01J20/321 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J20/3272 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J20/3282 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J20/3293 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J39/02 (CN,US);
B01J39/09 (CN,US);
B01J39/12 (CN,US);
B01J41/05 (CN,US);
B01J41/07 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J41/14 (CN,US);
B01J47/016 (EP,CN,KR);
C02F1/285 (EP,CN,KR);
C02F1/288 (EP,CN,KR);
C02F1/42 (CN,US);
C02F1/50 (CN,US);
A61L2101/46 (CN,US);
B01D2239/0442 (EP,CN,KR);
B01D2239/0485 (EP,CN,KR);
C02F2001/422 (CN,US);
C02F2101/103 (EP,CN,KR);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/10, A01N33/04 (EP);
A01N25/26, A01N33/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/41] | C02F1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | PARTIKEL MIT BIOZIDER BESCHICHTUNG | [2023/41] | English: | PARTICLES WITH BIOZIDAL COATING | [2023/41] | French: | PARTICULES POURVUES D'UN REVÊTEMENT BIOCIDE | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 07.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20713212.7 / EP3938449 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005263453 (COLLIAS DIMITRIS I [US], et al) [X] 11 * claims 1-17 * [Y] 13; | [A]JP2010254841 (NIPPON FILCON KK, et al) [A] 11* claims 1-5 *; | [X]CN102872832 (UNIV HOHAI) [X] 11,13 * examples 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [XY]EP2570182 (INSTRACTION GMBH [DE]) [X] 11 * paragraph [0077]; claims 1-11 * [Y] 13; | [XDY]WO2016030021 (INSTRACTION GMBH [DE]) [XD] 11 * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 8; claims 1-15 * [Y] 13; | [XY]WO2019025488 (INSTRACTION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,11 * page 9, lines 18-21; figures 1-9; examples 1,2,A1-A6; claims 1-12 * [Y] 13; | [Y] - SHUBO DENG ET AL, "Removal of perfluorooctane sulfonate from wastewater by anion exchange resins: Effects of resin properties and solution chemistry", WATER RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 44, no. 18, doi:10.1016/J.WATRES.2010.06.038, ISSN 0043-1354, (20101001), pages 5188 - 5195, (20100622), XP002624921 [Y] 13 * figure 1; tables 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2010.06.038 | [Y] - ATEIA MOHAMED ET AL, "Rapid Removal of Poly- and Perfluorinated Alkyl Substances by Poly(ethylenimine)-Functionalized Cellulose Microcrystals at Environmentally Relevant Conditions", ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, US, (20181107), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1021/acs.estlett.8b00556, ISSN 2328-8930, pages 764 - 769, XP093094431 [Y] 13 * figures 1-4; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.estlett.8b00556 | by applicant | DE102017007273 | DE20171007273 |