EP4273944 - LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIKE, Ikuko Anan-shi, Tokushima, 774-8601 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Ryo Anan-shi, Tokushima, 774-8601 / JP | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23189908.9 | 31.03.2016 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | JP20150076137 | 02.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015076137 | JP20160048776 | 11.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016048776 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4273944 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4273944 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/60, H01L33/52 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H01L33/52 (EP,US);
H01L33/486 (CN);
H01L33/0075 (US);
H01L33/32 (US);
H01L33/40 (US);
H01L33/54 (CN);
H01L33/56 (CN);
H01L33/58 (CN);
H01L33/60 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/32 (EP);
H01L2224/97 (EP);
H01L2933/0041 (US);
H01L2933/005 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/20 (US);
H01L33/38 (US);
H01L33/505 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | H01L33/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/34] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2023/45] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2023/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/34] | 18.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16163210.4 / EP3076444 | EP17172802.5 / EP3244459 | EP20184463.6 / EP3758079 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2535954 (NICHIA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0063] - [0067]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2014131753 (ISHIDA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0060] , [0 61] , [0 75] , [0 76]; figures 3, 4 * * paragraphs [0096] - [0104] * | by applicant | JP2010219324 | JP2012227470 | JP2013005646 | JP2013012545 |