EP4289430 - THROMBOLYTIC AGENT AND BEVACIZUMAB FOR TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL ISCHEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimojani LLC 158 Bridger Hollow Road Pray, MT 59065 / US | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUVAR, Lawrence M. San Francisco, 94109 / US | 02 /
JANIGRO, Damir Cleveland Heights, 44106 / US | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 23190012.7 | 04.01.2018 | [2023/50] | Priority number, date | US201762442826P | 05.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762442826 P | US201762470086P | 10.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762470086 P | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4289430 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4289430 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/49, A61K31/44, A61K31/444, C07K16/22, A61K39/395, A61P9/10, A61P25/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/4439, A61K31/47, A61K31/4709, A61K31/506, A61K31/53, A61K31/505, A61K31/545, A61K39/00, G01N33/49, C07K16/28, A61K31/404 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61K38/49 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K31/404 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/444 (EP);
A61K31/47 (EP);
A61K31/4709 (EP);
A61K31/506 (EP);
A61K31/53 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP,US);
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/404, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/444, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4709, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2023/50] | A61K31/4709 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | THROMBOLYTISCHES MITTEL UND BEVACIZUMAB ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HIRNISCHÄMIE | [2023/50] | English: | THROMBOLYTIC AGENT AND BEVACIZUMAB FOR TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL ISCHEMIA | [2023/50] | French: | AGENT THROMBOLYTIQUE ET BEVACIZUMAB POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ISCHÉMIE CÉRÉBRALE | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 20.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18736165.4 / EP3565546 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012189631 (SHIMOHATA TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * see [009], claims and examples *; | [Y]US2015258193 (KAUVAR LAWRENCE M [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * see [009]-[016], claims, examples *; | [XP]WO2017151043 (HAMRA INVEST AB [SE], et al) [XP] 1,5,6* see claims, examples and page 12 *; | [Y] - ZHENGGANG ZHANG AND MICHAEL CHOPP*, "Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor and Angiopoietins in Focal Cerebral Ischemia", TRENDS IN CARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, (20020101), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 62 - 66, XP055511882 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | [YD] - HAI-TAO ZHANG ET AL, "Early VEGF inhibition attenuates blood-brain barrier disruption in ischemic rat brains by regulating the expression of MMPs", MOLECULAR MEDICINE REPORTS, GR, (20161129), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.3892/mmr.2016.5974, ISSN 1791-2997, pages 57 - 64, XP055704240 [YD] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/mmr.2016.5974 | [YD] - ROBERT L AVERY ET AL, "Systemic pharmacokinetics following intravitreal injections of ranibizumab, bevacizumab or aflibercept in patients with neovascular AMD", BRITISH JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, GB, (20140707), vol. 98, no. 12, doi:10.1136/bjophthalmol-2014-305252, ISSN 0007-1161, pages 1636 - 1641, XP055704257 [YD] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/bjophthalmol-2014-305252 | [Y] - IVAN NOVITZKY ET AL, "Comparison of Neuroprotective Effect of Bevacizumab and Sildenafil following Induction of Stroke in a Mouse Model", BIOMED RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, (20160529), vol. 2016, doi:10.1155/2016/3938523, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1 - 8, XP055704271 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2016/3938523 | by applicant | US5766520 | US6884591 | US7144708 | US7153472 | WO2011013668 | WO2012154889 | US8313897 | US8652476 | WO2015138974 | US9439961 | - ZHANG, Z. G. et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20000000), vol. 106, pages 829 - 838 | - KANAZAWA, M. et al., J Cereb Blood Flow Metab, (20110000), vol. 31, pages 1461 - 74 | - ZHANG, H-T. et al., Mol Med Rep., (20170000), vol. 15, pages 57 - 64 | - MARCHI, N. et al., Res. Neurol. Neurosci., (20020000), vol. 20, pages 1 - 13 | - ZHOU, S. et al., Neurolog. Res., (20160000), vol. 38, pages 327 - 332 | - RUBIN, M. W. et al., The Neuro Hospitalist, (20150000), vol. 5, pages 161 - 172 | - WALTER, S., Lancet Neurology, (20120000), vol. 11, pages 397 - 404 | - EBINGER, M., JAMA, (20140000), vol. 311, pages 1622 - 1631 | - AVERY, R.L. et al., Br. J. Ophthalmol., (20140000), vol. 98, no. 12, pages 1636 - 41 | - Science, (20170000), vol. 658, page 1148 | - PUVENNA, V. et al., PLoS ONE, (20140000), vol. 9, no. 5, page e96296 | - LUKA, G. et al., Sensors, (20150000), vol. 15, pages 30011 - 30031 | - YOSHINO, K. et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (20140000), vol. 103, pages 1520 - 1528 | - DASSAN, P. et al., Cerebrovasc. Dis., (20090000), vol. 27, pages 295 - 302 | - KANAZAWA, M. et al., J. Cerebral Blood Flow and Metabolism, (20110000), vol. 31, pages 1461 - 1474 | WO2010JP62631 |