EP4268624 - CUTTING AND ARRANGING RODS FOR TOBACCO INDUSTRY PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAY, Andrew Jonathan London, WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
FALLON, Gary London, WC2R 3LA / GB | 03 /
LEROUX, Gerhard 7646 Paarl / ZA | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Brown, Alexander Edward Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 23190018.4 | 17.05.2017 | [2023/44] | Priority number, date | GB20160008810 | 19.05.2016 Original published format: GB 201608810 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4268624 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4268624 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/28, A24C5/47, A24C5/32, A24C5/33, A24D3/02 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A24C5/336 (EP,KR,US);
A24C5/28 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A24C5/327 (EP,US);
A24C5/47 (KR);
A24C5/472 (EP,US);
A24C5/475 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/44] | A24C5/47 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2023/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEN UND ANORDNEN VON STANGEN FÜR PRODUKTE DER TABAKINDUSTRIE | [2023/44] | English: | CUTTING AND ARRANGING RODS FOR TOBACCO INDUSTRY PRODUCTS | [2023/44] | French: | COUPE ET AGENCEMENT DE BÂTONNETS POUR PRODUITS DE L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17725730.0 / EP3457872 | EP20183263.1 / EP3735843 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE960346 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | [XAY]US4090602 (SCHUBERT BERNHARD, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 41 - column 8, line 45 * [A] 8,9,14,15 [Y] 4,11-13; | [A]EP0580150 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15* figure 2 *; | [XAY]US6354300 (SCHLISIO SIEGFRIED [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,10 * figures 1-4 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 57 * * column 2, line 66 - line 67 * * column 3, line 28 - line 38 * * column 3, line 37 - line 45 * [A] 8,9,14,15 [Y] 11-13 |