EP4246827 - CHANNEL QUALITY FEEDBACK METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Qianxi Guangdong, 523860 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Zhenshan Guangdong, 523860 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Huei-Ming Victoria, 3141 / AU | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/38] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 23190043.2 | 06.11.2019 | [2023/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4246827 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4246827 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04B7/0417, H04B7/06, // H04W92/18, H04B7/00, H04L5/00, H04L25/02 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,KR);
H04W4/70 (CN);
H04W72/563 (US);
H04B7/0417 (EP);
H04B7/063 (EP,KR);
H04B7/0632 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0057 (EP);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04W76/14 (KR);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR);
H04L25/0202 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR KANALQUALITÄTSFEEDBACK | [2023/38] | English: | CHANNEL QUALITY FEEDBACK METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉTROACTION DE QUALITÉ DE CANAL | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19951926.5 / EP4037430 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014241262 (NOVAK ROBERT [CA], et al); | [Y]US2018220439 (LEE SUNYOUNG [KR], et al); | [Y]CN109644455 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); |