EP4339065 - DEVICE FOR A SUPPORT OF A TRACTION AND BUFFING DEVICE OF A COUPLING, IN PARTICULAR OF A RAILWAY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faiveley Transport Schwab AG Ebnatstrasse 150A 8207 Schaffhausen / CH | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAAS, Stefan 9050 Appenzell / CH | 02 /
HENCHE, Fabian 42897 Remscheid / DE | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 23190071.3 | 07.08.2023 | [2024/12] | Priority number, date | CH20220001067 | 13.09.2022 Original published format: CH 10672022 | [2024/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4339065 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B61G9/22, B61G9/04 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B61G9/04 (EP,CH);
B61G9/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HALTERUNG EINER ZUG- UND STOSSVORRICHTUNG EINER KUPPLUNG INSBESONDERE EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGS | [2024/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR A SUPPORT OF A TRACTION AND BUFFING DEVICE OF A COUPLING, IN PARTICULAR OF A RAILWAY VEHICLE | [2024/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE SUPPORT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRACTION ET DE POUSSÉE D'UN EMBRAYAGE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 28.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1257190 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG) [A] 1-14* figure 1 *; | [XAI]CN202669839U (CSR QISHUYAN INST CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,11 * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,6-10,12,13 [I] 14; | [A]US10189488 (CLARK MARLIN E [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 5-8 *; | [AD]EP3792137 (FAIVELEY TRANSP SCHWAB AG [CH]) [AD] 1-14 * figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | EP3792137 |