EP4268641 - AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE AND OPERATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KT & G Corporation 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Hyung Jin 06993 Seoul / KR | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 23190138.0 | 09.12.2020 | [2023/44] | Priority number, date | KR20200015173 | 07.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200015173 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4268641 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4268641 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/50, A24F40/51, // A24F40/30, A24F40/20, A24F40/57 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
A24F40/50 (EP,CN,KR);
A24F40/40 (CN,US);
A24F40/51 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A24F40/10 (CN);
A24F40/20 (EP,CN);
A24F40/46 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/44] | A24F40/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/44] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE AND OPERATION METHOD THEREOF | [2023/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 01.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20883280.8 / EP3886616 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017135404 (REEVELL TONY [GB]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1A-3C *; | [X]EP3406148 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO2018216961 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0112]; figures 1-11 *; | [X]WO2019197170 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1-10 * page 7, line 23 - page 11, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [XP]WO2020105896 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [XP] 1-10 * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0188]; figures 1-29 * |