EP4246976 - INTER PREDICTION METHOD, VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND TRANSMISSION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDRY, Hendry 137-130 Seoul / KR | 02 /
PARK, Seungwook 137-130 Seoul / KR | 03 /
LIM, Jaehyun 137-130 Seoul / KR | 04 /
JEON, Yongjoon 137-130 Seoul / KR | 05 /
KIM, Chulkeun 137-130 Seoul / KR | 06 /
KIM, Jungsun 137-130 Seoul / KR | 07 /
PARK, Naeri 137-130 Seoul / KR | 08 /
JEON, Byeongmoon 137-130 Seoul / KR | 09 /
PARK, Joonyoung 137-130 Seoul / KR | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23190393.1 | 21.09.2012 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | US201161537586P | 22.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161537586 P | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4246976 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4246976 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/503, H04N19/46, H04N19/70, H04N19/423, H04N19/573, H04N19/44, H04N19/577 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04N19/423 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/573 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/503 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/577 (US);
H04N19/105 (KR);
H04N19/132 (KR);
H04N19/176 (KR);
H04N19/44 (US);
H04N19/46 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H04N19/577 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] |
Former [2023/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INTERPRÄDIKTIONSVERFAHREN, VIDEOCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/38] | English: | INTER PREDICTION METHOD, VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND TRANSMISSION METHOD | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INTERPRÉDICTION, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE VIDÉO ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12833949.6 / EP2750387 | EP18211354.8 / EP3474551 | EP22153709.5 / EP4017006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |