EP4245272 - TRANSCATHETER PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH PROTECTIVE FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3567 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUGHAN, Brendan Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 02 /
BRITTON, Maeve Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 03 /
BARAJAS-TORRES, Martha Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 04 /
DESHMUKH, Susheel Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 05 /
MENDOZA, Leonal Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 06 /
SOM, Siyan Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 07 /
SILVER, Michele Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 08 /
TRAN, Don Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 09 /
BROWN, Nathan Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 10 /
MENDELSON, Jill Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23190587.8 | 06.06.2017 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | US201662345957P | 06.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662345957 P | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4245272 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4245272 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24, A61F2/95 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61F2/2436 (EP,US);
A61F2/2439 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (US);
A61F2/2427 (US);
A61F2002/9534 (US);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0057 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | A61F2/95 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | TRANSKATHETER-FREISETZUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE HERZKLAPPENPROTHESE MIT SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG | [2023/38] | English: | TRANSCATHETER PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH PROTECTIVE FEATURE | [2023/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POSE DE VALVE CARDIAQUE PROTHÉTIQUE TRANSCATHÉTER À ÉLÉMENT DE PROTECTION | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 20.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17739360.0 / EP3463194 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005187536 (SHELSO SUSAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO2014056754 (CORMOVE [FR]) [A] 1-12* figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US5957949 |