EP4321708 - REINFORCING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basile, Davide Via Romea Sud, 264/B 48124 Ravenna / IT | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Roncuzzi, Davide Roncuzzi & Associati S.r.l. Via Antica Zecca, 6 48121 Ravenna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2024/07] | Roncuzzi, Davide Roncuzzi & Associati S.r.l. Via Antica Zecca, 6 48121 Ravenna / IT | Application number, filing date | 23190656.1 | 09.08.2023 | [2024/07] | Priority number, date | IT20220017109 | 10.08.2022 Original published format: IT202200017109 | [2024/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321708 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04G23/02, E04B1/26, E04H9/02 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
E04G23/0218 (EP);
E04H9/025 (EP);
E04H9/027 (EP);
E04B1/215 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/38] |
Former [2024/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2024/07] | English: | REINFORCING EQUIPMENT | [2024/07] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE RENFORCEMENT | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/38] | 14.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009203763 (ANDO CORP, et al); | [Y]ITBO20120564 (GALLUCCIO ANTON MASSIMO); | [A]US2018274253 (KEPPER JIMMIE [US]); | [Y]KR101999527B (YOON CHAE HO [KR]) | by applicant | IT201202092417 | KR101999527B |