EP4349265 - ULTRASONIC PUNCTURE GUIDANCE PLANNING SYSTEM BASED ON MULTI-MODAL MEDICAL IMAGE REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbon (Shenzhen) Medical Device Co., Ltd. Room 203, Building 5B, Skyworth Innovation Valley Tangtou No. 1 Road, Tangtou Community Shiyan Street Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518101 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2024/15] | For all designated states Carbon (Shenzhen) Medical Device Co., Ltd. Room 203, Building 5B, Skyworth Innovation Valley Tangtou No. 1 Road, Tangtou Community Shiyan Street 518101 Shenzhen City Guangdong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Xiongwen Shenzhen City / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Rongliang Shenzhen City / CN | 03 /
WANG, Shanshan Shenzhen City / CN | 04 /
BURSTEIN, Pablo David Shenzhen City / CN | 05 /
WU, Menglin Shenzhen City / CN | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 23191316.1 | 14.08.2023 | [2024/15] | Priority number, date | CN202211219688 | 08.10.2022 Original published format: CN202211219688 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349265 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12, A61B8/00, A61B8/08, A61B34/20 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06T7/33 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (CN);
A61B34/10 (CN,US);
A61B17/3403 (CN,US);
A61B34/20 (CN);
A61B8/12 (EP);
A61B8/4254 (EP,US);
A61B8/4416 (EP);
A61B8/463 (US);
A61B8/5261 (EP,US);
G06T15/005 (CN);
G06T15/08 (US);
G06T17/20 (US);
G06T5/70 (US);
G06T7/30 (CN);
G06T7/344 (US);
G06T7/38 (US);
G06T7/70 (CN);
G16H30/20 (US);
G16H30/40 (US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP);
A61B2017/3411 (US);
A61B2017/3413 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/105 (CN);
A61B2034/107 (CN);
A61B2034/108 (CN);
A61B2034/2051 (EP);
A61B2034/2063 (CN);
A61B2034/2065 (CN);
A61B2090/374 (EP);
A61B2090/378 (EP);
A61B2562/0223 (EP);
A61B34/25 (EP);
A61B8/0841 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/10028 (CN,US);
G06T2207/10081 (CN);
G06T2207/10088 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/10132 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10136 (CN);
G06T2207/30081 (EP);
G06T2207/30096 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLPUNKTIONSFÜHRUNGSPLANUNGSSYSTEM AUF DER BASIS VON MULTIMODALER MEDIZINISCHER BILDREGISTRIERUNG | [2024/15] | English: | ULTRASONIC PUNCTURE GUIDANCE PLANNING SYSTEM BASED ON MULTI-MODAL MEDICAL IMAGE REGISTRATION | [2024/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PLANIFICATION DE GUIDAGE DE PONCTION ULTRASONORE BASÉ SUR UN ENREGISTREMENT MULTIMODAL D'IMAGES MÉDICALES | [2024/15] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2021179208 (SUZHOU LEAPMED HEALTHCARE CORP [CN]) [Y] 5 * figure - * [A] 1-4,6-9; | [IY] - DONGWEN ZHANG ET AL, "An optical tracker based robot registration and servoing method for ultrasound guided percutaneous renal access", BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING ONLINE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON, GB, (20130524), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1475-925X-12-47, ISSN 1475-925X, page 47, XP021152290 [I] 1-4,6-10 * Abstract, Methods, Results * [Y] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-925X-12-47 | [AP] - WU MENGLIN ET AL, "Weakly supervised volumetric prostate registration for MRI-TRUS image driven by signed distance map", COMPUTERS IN BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, US, vol. 163, doi:10.1016/j.compbiomed.2023.107150, ISSN 0010-4825, (20230901), page 107150, URL: https://pdf.sciencedirectassets.com/271150/1-s2.0-S0010482523X00109/1-s2.0-S0010482523006157/main.pdf?X-Amz-Security-Token=IQoJb3JpZ2luX2VjENP//////////wEaCXVzLWVhc3QtMSJGMEQCIFKEksYoxyIZDGJqwjT6u+MXvnsvbg5wWnXR0YnynQnSAiApONpx5FU6IAXrnZgYr2NjCVrQaAKPZ/cG6CfOGmwUdiq8BQiM//////////8BEAUaDDA1OTAwMzU0N, XP093123762 [AP] 1-10 * Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compbiomed.2023.107150 |