EP4327709 - VACUUM CLEANER, PREFERABLY HAND VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodehüser, Tobias 59329 Wadersloh / DE | 02 /
Rech, Thomas 53881 Euskirchen / DE | 03 /
Schaefer-van den Boom, Klaus 53489 Sinzig / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23191660.2 | 16.08.2023 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | DE202210121452 | 25.08.2022 Original published format: DE102022121452 | [2024/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327709 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A47L5/24 (EP);
A47L5/26 (EP);
A47L5/30 (EP);
A47L9/0411 (EP);
A47L9/0477 (EP);
A47L9/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGER, VORZUGSWEISE HANDSTAUBSAUGER | [2024/09] | English: | VACUUM CLEANER, PREFERABLY HAND VACUUM CLEANER | [2024/09] | French: | ASPIRATEUR, DE PRÉFÉRENCE ASPIRATEUR À MAIN | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 28.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2245974 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * [A] 2,5,6,10; | [A]US2011234132 (NORELL NEIL N [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 59 *; | [A]US2017273523 (KASPER GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0052]; figures 5-8 * | by applicant | DE102007021299 |