EP4331664 - A SYSTEM FOR MONITORING POSITION OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vision RT Limited Dove House Arcadia Avenue London N3 2JU / GB | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRETT, Adrian Roger William London, N3 2JU / GB | 02 /
WAGHORN, Benjamin James London, N3 2JU / GB | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Demant Demant A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23192989.4 | 23.08.2023 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | EP20220193158 | 31.08.2022 Original published format: EP 22193158 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4331664 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, G06F3/16, G16H20/40 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61N5/1049 (EP,CN);
G16H40/63 (EP,CN);
A61B6/0492 (US);
A61B6/032 (US);
A61B6/035 (CN);
A61B6/461 (US);
A61B6/52 (CN);
A61B6/54 (CN);
G06F3/167 (EP);
G10L15/22 (CN);
G10L25/48 (CN);
G16H40/20 (CN);
A61B2560/0493 (US);
A61B2562/0204 (US);
A61N2005/1059 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER POSITION EINES PATIENTEN | [2024/10] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR MONITORING POSITION OF A PATIENT | [2024/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE POSITION D'UN PATIENT | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/42] | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008172789 (ELLIOT DERICK [US], et al); | [XI]US2016191887 (CASAS CARLOS QUILES [ES]); | [X]US2017103440 (XING ZHOU TIAN [US], et al); | [XI]US2019254757 (PIRON CAMERON ANTHONY [CA], et al); | [XI]US2019380792 (POLTARETSKYI SERGII [FR], et al); | [XI]US2020268472 (WOLF TAMIR [US], et al); | [XI]US2020352657 (FANSON RICHARD TYLER [CA], et al); | [X]WO2021163039 (INSIGHT MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) | by applicant | WO2016181156 |