EP4333223 - BRANCH BUSBAR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited Corporation Eaton House / 30 Pembroke Road D04 70CT Dublin / IE | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMMERS, Adri Jan Willem 7558 TV Overijssel / NL | 02 /
HEILERSIG, Dinant Johan 7475 CC Overijssel / NL | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Jolliffe, Jack Louis, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23193061.1 | 23.08.2023 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | GB20220012628 | 31.08.2022 Original published format: GB 202212628 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4333223 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/02, H02B13/035, H01H33/24 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H02B13/02 (EP);
H02B1/20 (GB);
H02B1/202 (US);
H01R4/66 (US);
H02B13/0358 (EP,US);
H02G5/00 (GB);
H01H31/26 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABZWEIGSCHIENEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/10] | English: | BRANCH BUSBAR DEVICE | [2024/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BARRE DE DÉRIVATION | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/42] | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2442405 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * figures 6, 7, 8; claims 1, 2 * [I] 3,9,11; | [XYI]WO2006089644 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * page 10, paragraph last - page 11, paragraph first; figures 2, 5 * [Y] 4 [I] 11; | [Y]JP2007104840 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 4* paragraph [0002]; figure 11 *; | [XI]CN100481661C (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * figures 1, 3, 4 * [I] 9; | [XYI]EP1504508 (EATON ELECTRIC BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11 * paragraph [0040]; figure 5 * [Y] 4 [I] 3,9; | [XYI]US2016049775 (SAXEGAARD MAGNE [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044]; figures 2a-2c, 5 * [Y] 4 [I] 3,9 |