EP4300014 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Gyuyeon 641-711 Changwon-si / KR | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23193165.0 | 02.08.2011 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | KR20100080083 | 19.08.2010 Original published format: KR 20100080083 | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4300014 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/24, F25C5/02, F25C5/18 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
F25C1/04 (EP,US);
F25C1/24 (US);
F25C5/02 (EP,US);
F25C5/18 (EP,US);
F25D23/04 (EP,US);
F25C2305/0221 (EP,US);
F25C2400/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | KÜHLSCHRANK | [2024/01] | English: | REFRIGERATOR | [2024/01] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 28.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11818317.7 / EP2606293 | EP20164811.0 / EP3690362 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0618871U (N. N.) [Y] 6-8 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [Y]KR20030038994 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 6-8 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2006086135 (WU GUOLIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0119]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2008006048 (YOON JONG S [KR], et al) [Y] 9,10* figures 1-2 *; | [X]KR20080018304 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0071]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO2009008608 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0044] - [0045]; figures 1-2 *; | [XAYI]US2010192614 (KIM DAE-YEON [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0110]; figures 11-12 * [A] 13,14 [Y] 6-10 [I] 5,11,12,15 |