EP4329117 - ARRANGEMENT OF A CURRENT TRANSFORMER CORE AT AN INTERFACE WITH A CONICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleinschmidt, Andreas 16515 Oranienburg / DE | 02 /
Beutel, Stefan 10555 Berlin / DE | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23193332.6 | 24.08.2023 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | US202263400494P | 24.08.2022 Original published format: US 202263400494 P | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329117 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/035 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H02B13/0358 (EP);
H02B13/0356 (EP,US);
H02B13/0352 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2024/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG EINES STROMWANDLERKERNS AN EINER SCHNITTSTELLE MIT EINEM KONISCHEN VERBINDER | [2024/09] | English: | ARRANGEMENT OF A CURRENT TRANSFORMER CORE AT AN INTERFACE WITH A CONICAL CONNECTOR | [2024/09] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'UN NOYAU DE TRANSFORMATEUR DE COURANT À UNE INTERFACE AVEC UN CONNECTEUR CONIQUE | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6016247 (DAMS JOACHIM [FR], et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 22 * * column 6, line 10 - column 7, line 3 * * figures 2, 5 * [I] 2-4,6-8; | [XI]WO2015076029 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 4, 14 *[I] 2-4,6-8; | [XI]EP3001521 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [ 0033] , [ 0034] * * figures 10, 11 * [I] 2-4,6-8 |