EP4252786 - ANTIBACTERIAL NANOFIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConvaTec Technologies Inc. 3993 Howard Hughes Parkway Suite 250 Las Vegas, NV 89169 / US | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSSAIN, Mohammad Forhad 1212 Gulshan Dhaka / BD | 02 /
GONG, Hugh R Manchester, WA15 7PG / GB | 03 /
BALLAMY, Lucy Llangollen Denbighshire Wales, LL20 7BX / GB | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23193492.8 | 28.04.2016 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | US201562154056P | 28.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562154056 P | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4252786 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4252786 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/42, A61L15/28, A61L15/24, A61L15/26, A61L15/62 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61L15/28 (EP,US);
A61L15/44 (US);
A61L15/62 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2300/802 (EP,US);
A61L2400/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/28, C08L5/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | A61L15/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTIBAKTERIELLE NANOFASERN | [2023/40] | English: | ANTIBACTERIAL NANOFIBRES | [2023/40] | French: | NANOFIBRES ANTIBACTÉRIENNES | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 14.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16787182.1 / EP3288600 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005008776 (CHHABRA RAJEEV [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0043] *; | [A]GB2416781 (LIGHTEX LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 18 - line 23 * * page 23, line 16 - page 27, line 14 *; | [A]WO2006108364 (ELMARCO SRO [CZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009141633 (CONVATEC TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 2 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 4 * * page 5, line 18 - line 24 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 3 *; | [A]US2009324893 (SOEDER JENS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] *; | [A]WO2014020131 (CRAWFORD HEALTHCARE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 1, line 26 - page 3, line 3 * * page 18, line 13 - page 19, line 5 * * page 22, line 14 - line 37 *; | [A]WO2014066297 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 17 * * page 8, line 21 - line 29 * * page 11, line 15 - line 29 * * page 12, line 16 - page 14, line 2 *; | [A] - WANG SHAN ET AL, "Functionalization of electrospun [beta]-cyclodextrin/polyacrylonitrile (PAN) with silver nanoparticles: Broad-spectrum antibacterial property", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (20120820), vol. 261, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2012.08.044, ISSN 0169-4332, pages 499 - 503, XP028951171 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2012.08.044 | [A] - AYTAC ZEYNEP ET AL, "Release and antibacterial activity of allyl isothiocyanate/[beta]-cyclodextrin complex encapsulated in electrospun nanofibers", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. B, BIOINTERFACES, (20140522), vol. 120, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFB.2014.04.006, ISSN 0927-7765, pages 125 - 131, XP028858955 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfb.2014.04.006 |