EP4333130 - BATTERY CELL, BATTERY, AND ELECTRIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningde Amperex Technology Ltd. No.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Fujian Province Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Shaojun Ningde City, Fujian Province, People s Republic of China, 352100 / CN | 02 /
LAO, Shaojiang Ningde City, Fujian Province, People s Republic of China, 352100 / CN | 03 /
LAI, Shibin Ningde City, Fujian Province, People s Republic of China, 352100 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Aosheng Ningde City, Fujian Province, People s Republic of China, 352100 / CN | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23193866.3 | 29.08.2023 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | CN20221148622 | 30.08.2022 Original published format: CN202211048622 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4333130 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4333130 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, H01M50/105, H01M50/119, H01M50/134, H01M50/136, // H01M4/02, H01M4/04 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H01M4/661 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/134 (EP,CN);
H01M4/64 (CN);
H01M50/105 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/119 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/136 (EP,CN);
H01M50/46 (US);
H01M50/586 (CN);
H01M2004/021 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEZELLE, BATTERIE UND ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/10] | English: | BATTERY CELL, BATTERY, AND ELECTRIC DEVICE | [2024/10] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE, BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 01.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4635978B ; | [A]KR20160125915 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]CN109873164 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD); | [Y]CN113972422 (NINGDE AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD); | [Y]CN114730943 (NINGDE AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD) |