EP4339656 - PROJECTOR CONFIGURATION WITH SUBDIVIDED OPTICAL APERTURE FOR NEAR-EYE DISPLAYS, AND CORRESPONDING OPTICAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumus Ltd. 8 Pinhas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISENFELD, Tsion 7835515 Ashkelon / IL | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 23193946.3 | 14.05.2019 | [2024/12] | Priority number, date | US201862670886P | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862670886 P | [2024/12] | Previously filed application, date | WO2019IB53972 | 14.05.2019 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4339656 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4339656 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/00, G02B27/01 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G02B3/005 (EP,IL,KR);
G02B27/0172 (EP,IL,KR);
G02B6/003 (IL,KR,US);
G02B6/0035 (IL,KR,US);
G02B2027/0123 (EP,IL,KR)
|
Former IPC [2024/12] | G02B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | PROJEKTORKONFIGURATION MIT UNTERTEILTER OPTISCHER APERTUR FÜR AUGENNAHE ANZEIGEN UND ENTSPRECHENDE OPTISCHE SYSTEME | [2024/12] | English: | PROJECTOR CONFIGURATION WITH SUBDIVIDED OPTICAL APERTURE FOR NEAR-EYE DISPLAYS, AND CORRESPONDING OPTICAL SYSTEMS | [2024/12] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE PROJECTEUR AVEC OUVERTURE OPTIQUE SUBDIVISÉE POUR AFFICHAGES PROCHES DE L' IL, ET SYSTÈMES OPTIQUES CORRESPONDANTS | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19802792.2 / EP3625617 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3544190 (MOORHUSEN ROBERT W, et al); | [A]US2008158685 (AMITAI YAAKOV [IL]); | [A]WO2017102795 (ZEISS CARL AG [DE]); | [A]US2018101087 (SHINOHARA MASAYUKI [JP]) | by applicant | US6829095 | US7021777 | US7457040 | US7576916 | US8643948 |