EP4339720 - SYSTEM, CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Yasuhiro Tokyo / JP | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 23194753.2 | 01.09.2023 | [2024/12] | Priority number, date | JP20220145571 | 13.09.2022 Original published format: JP 2022145571 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4339720 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05, H04L12/427 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G05B19/054 (EP);
H04L12/40071 (KR);
H04L41/085 (US);
G06F13/4247 (KR);
H01J37/3174 (KR);
H04L12/40058 (KR);
H04L12/427 (EP);
H04L67/12 (US);
G05B19/418 (KR);
G05B2219/1215 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/44] |
Former [2024/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND PROGRAMM | [2024/12] | English: | SYSTEM, CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR, AND PROGRAM | [2024/12] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ ET PROGRAMME | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/44] | 20.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2017170983 (IWAI MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [A]US11374788 (TAHARA YUTAKA [JP]) | by applicant | JPH0315018B |