EP4335786 - RETAINING SYSTEM FOR A BELT OF A BELT CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.B. Automazione S.r.l. Via Guglielmo Marconi 38 27010 Vellezzo Bellini PV / IT | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLSIERI, Fabrizio 27010 Vellezzo Bellini PV / IT | 02 /
BOLSIERI, Giampiero 27010 Vellezzo Bellini PV / IT | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Rondano, Davide Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 23194888.6 | 01.09.2023 | [2024/11] | Priority number, date | IT20220018192 | 06.09.2022 Original published format: IT202200018192 | [2024/11] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4335786 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/02, B65G39/16 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
B65G15/02 (EP);
B65G39/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN BAND EINES BANDFÖRDERERS | [2024/11] | English: | RETAINING SYSTEM FOR A BELT OF A BELT CONVEYOR | [2024/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉTENTION POUR UNE BANDE D'UN CONVOYEUR À BANDE | [2024/11] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JPH0524622 (NITTA KK) [I] 1,5,6 * abstract *[A] 2-4 |