EP4338888 - IMPACT TOOL WITH FRONT LUBRICATION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. 525 Harbour Place Drive, Suite 600 Davidson, NC 28036 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eardley, Edward Easton / US | 02 /
Johnson, Joshua Allentown / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 23194909.0 | 01.09.2023 | [2024/12] | Priority number, date | US202263404063P | 06.09.2022 Original published format: US 202263404063 P | US202318239403 | 29.08.2023 Original published format: US202318239403 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4338888 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/02 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B25B21/026 (EP);
B25B21/02 (US);
B25D17/26 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAGWERKZEUG MIT FRONTSCHMIERANORDNUNG | [2024/12] | English: | IMPACT TOOL WITH FRONT LUBRICATION ASSEMBLY | [2024/12] | French: | OUTIL À PERCUSSION AVEC ENSEMBLE DE LUBRIFICATION AVANT | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 29.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3734515 (DUDEK E) [A] 1-5,12,13,16-18 * column 2, lines 44-57; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1712332 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,12,16 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US2017036327 (MURAKAMI TAKUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,8-11,13,16-18 * paragraph [0078]; figures 12,13(1) *; | [A]US2019262978 (TEJIMA HARUKI [JP], et al) [A] 6,7,13,14,19,20* paragraphs [0043] , [0049]; figure 4 * |