EP4346147 - BASE STATION DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION AND TRANSMISSION DESIGN FOR ENERGY SAVING NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Correction of patent application | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Liang San Jose, CA, 95134 / US | 02 /
SARTORI, Philippe San Jose, CA, 95134 / US | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23195025.4 | 04.09.2023 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | US202263410037P | 26.09.2022 Original published format: US 202263410037 P | US202318365018 | 03.08.2023 Original published format: US202318365018 | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4346147 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP4346147 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W52/02, H04W76/28 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,KR);
H04W76/28 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0206 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04W52/0219 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2024/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTWURF FÜR DISKONTINUIERLICHEN EMPFANG UND ÜBERTRAGUNG EINER BASISSTATION FÜR EIN ENERGIESPARENDES NETZWERK | [2024/14] | English: | BASE STATION DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION AND TRANSMISSION DESIGN FOR ENERGY SAVING NETWORK | [2024/14] | French: | CONCEPTION DE RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE ET DE TRANSMISSION DE STATION DE BASE POUR RÉSEAU D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE | [2024/14] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 22.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3154308 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [X]EP4007379 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]US2022210866 (HE CHAO [US], et al); |