EP4303883 - MANAGEMENT OF MEDICATION PREPARATION WITH DYNAMIC PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter Corporation Englewood 9540 South Maroon Circle Englewood, CO 80112 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PADMANI, Bhavesh S. Hawthorn Woods, 60047 / US | 02 /
ABBASI, Ghalib A. Englewood, 80112 / US | 03 /
HIRAVE, Bapu Laxman Englewood, 80112 / US | 04 /
CROOKS, Matthew Englewood, 80112 / US | 05 /
YASSINE, Maher F. Englewood, 80112 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 23195179.9 | 10.11.2015 | [2024/02] | Priority number, date | US201462077759P | 10.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462077759 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4303883 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4303883 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/10, G16H40/20 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0631 (EP);
G16H40/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2024/02] | G16H40/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG DER ARZNEIMITTELZUBEREITUNG MIT DYNAMISCHER VERARBEITUNG | [2024/02] | English: | MANAGEMENT OF MEDICATION PREPARATION WITH DYNAMIC PROCESSING | [2024/02] | French: | GESTION DE LA PRÉPARATION DE MÉDICATION À TRAITEMENT DYNAMIQUE | [2024/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15858745.1 / EP3218866 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003076736 (BUKER DANA [US], et al) [I] 1-10* the whole document *; | [I]US2014022569 (MATSUI SHIOMI [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2014065872 (BAXTER CORP ENGLEWOOD [US]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]US2014156294 (TRIBBLE DENNIS [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]US2014214436 (UTECH THOMAS WILLIAM [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20190619755 |