EP4335802 - FILM ROLL SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ishida Co., Ltd. 44, Sanno-cho Shogoin Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANE, Masayuki Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | 02 /
ICHIKAWA, Makoto Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | 03 /
HASHIMOTO, Satoshi Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | 04 /
TONG, Yuchuan Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 23196114.5 | 07.09.2023 | [2024/11] | Priority number, date | JP20220143032 | 08.09.2022 Original published format: JP 2022143032 | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4335802 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12, B65B41/16 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
B65H19/123 (EP);
B65H19/12 (US);
B65B41/16 (EP);
B65H2301/41387 (EP);
B65H2301/41745 (EP);
B65H2301/418 (US);
B65H2402/31 (EP);
B65H2553/51 (EP);
B65H2701/191 (EP);
B65H2801/81 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLIENROLLENZUFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/11] | English: | FILM ROLL SUPPLY DEVICE | [2024/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION DE ROULEAU DE FILM | [2024/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0524828 (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 1-25, 40-50 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 3 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 6-10; | [XA]US2018141772 (PRANKL IRMENGARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0026] , [ 0041] , [ 0053] , [ 0072] - [0075] * * figures 1, 2, 6A-6C *[A] 4-10 | by applicant | JP2002337817 |