EP4289443 - STABILIZED ANTIBODY PROTEIN SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arecor Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden CB10 1XL / GB | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEZEK, Jan Saffron Walden, CB10 1XL / GB | 02 /
GERRING, David Saffron Walden, CB10 1XL / GB | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/50] | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow, SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 23196633.4 | 23.02.2018 | [2023/50] | Priority number, date | GB20170003063 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: GB 201703063 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4289443 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4289443 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, A61K39/395 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
C07K16/3061 (EP);
A61K39/39591 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/183 (US);
C07K16/2887 (US);
A61K2039/54 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/50] | A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2023/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE ANTIKÖRPERPROTEINLÖSUNGEN | [2023/50] | English: | STABILIZED ANTIBODY PROTEIN SOLUTIONS | [2023/50] | French: | SOLUTIONS DE PROTÉINES D'ANTICORPS STABILISÉES | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 27.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18708465.2 / EP3585820 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012013980 (JEZEK JAN [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 2-3 *; | [I] - WANG WEI ED - BLANCO-PRIETO MARIA J ET AL, "Instability, stabilization, and formulation of liquid protein pharmaceuticals", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER, NL, (19990820), vol. 185, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0378-5173(99)00152-0, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 129 - 188, XP002323952 [I] 1-15 * page 138, column l, paragraph 2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(99)00152-0 | [I] - CARPENTER J F ET AL, "Rational design of stable lyophilized protein formulations: Some practical advice", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, US, (19970101), vol. 14, no. 8, doi:10.1023/A:1012180707283, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 969 - 975, XP002303280 [I] 1-15 * page 971, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 972, column l, paragraph last * * page 973, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 974, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012180707283 | [I] - AKERS MICHAEL J ET AL, "FORMULATION DEVELOPMENT OF PROTEIN DOSAGE FORMS", PHARMACEUTICAL BIOTECHNOLOGY, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL, (20020101), vol. 14, ISSN 1078-0467, pages 47 - 127, XP001537612 [I] 1-15 * page 49, paragraph 1 * | [I] - VINCENT VAGENENDE ET AL, "Mechanisms of Protein Stabilization and Prevention of Protein Aggregation by Glycerol", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 48, no. 46, doi:10.1021/BI900649T, ISSN 0006-2960, (20091124), pages 11084 - 11096, (20091009), XP002686709 [I] 1-15 * page 11094, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BI900649T | [I] - DAUGHERTY ANN L ET AL, CHAPTER 8: Formulation and delivery issues for monoclonal antibody therapeutics, CURRENT TRENDS IN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY DEVELOPMENT AND MANUFACTURING, SPRINGER, US, PAGE(S) 103 - 129, (20100101), ISBN 978-0-387-76642-3, XP009180430 [I] 1-15 * page 107, paragraph 2 * * page 110, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-0-387-76643-0_8 | by applicant | WO03072060 | WO2006081587 | WO2007109221 | WO2008084237 | EP2238985 |