EP4397788 - WEAR RESISTANT ARTICLE AND METHOD OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADHARAPURAPU, Raghavendra Rao Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 23198923.7 | 21.09.2023 | [2024/28] | Priority number, date | IN202311001109 | 05.01.2023 Original published format: IN202311001109 | US202318298409 | 11.04.2023 Original published format: US202318298409 | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4397788 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/08, C23C24/10, C23C30/00, B22F3/105, B22F7/00, C22C45/00, F01D5/28 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
C23C24/085 (EP);
B32B15/01 (EP);
C22C45/02 (EP);
C22C45/04 (EP);
C22C45/08 (EP);
C22C45/10 (EP);
C23C24/10 (EP);
C23C30/00 (EP);
F01D5/147 (EP);
F01D5/288 (EP);
B22F10/28 (EP);
B22F10/64 (EP);
B22F2007/068 (EP);
B22F5/04 (EP);
B22F7/06 (EP);
B22F7/08 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y40/20 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
C22C1/053 (EP);
C22C2200/02 (EP);
C22C32/0073 (EP);
C22C32/0078 (EP);
F05D2220/36 (EP);
F05D2240/303 (EP);
F05D2240/304 (EP);
F05D2300/11 (EP);
F05D2300/121 (EP);
F05D2300/123 (EP);
F05D2300/13 (EP);
F05D2300/131 (EP);
F05D2300/132 (EP);
F05D2300/133 (EP);
F05D2300/134 (EP);
F05D2300/1431 (EP);
F05D2300/1432 (EP);
F05D2300/1435 (EP);
F05D2300/161 (EP);
F05D2300/2102 (EP);
F05D2300/211 (EP);
F05D2300/22 (EP);
F05D2300/222 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F2007/068, B22F5/04, B22F2003/242, C22C2200/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLEISSFESTER ARTIKEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/28] | English: | WEAR RESISTANT ARTICLE AND METHOD OF MAKING | [2024/28] | French: | ARTICLE RÉSISTANT À L'USURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2024/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2011204700 (BLUE CRAIG A [US], et al); | [A]WO2018218077 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]); | [IA]US11014162 (HOFMANN DOUGLAS C [US]); | [X]EP4092287 (KOLON INC [KR]); | [XAI]EP4092309 (KOLON INC [KR]) | by applicant | IN202311001109 |