EP4332417 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING FAILURE IN A BACK PRESSURE BALANCED RELIEF VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emerson Automation Solutions Final Control US LP 10707 Clay Road Houston, TX 77041 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALYANASUNDARAM, Vishwa Stafford, Texas, 77477 / US | 02 /
SI, Katherine Houston, Texas, 77041 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23198968.2 | 30.04.2021 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | US202063017767P | 30.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063017767 P | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332417 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/04, F16K37/00, F16K41/12 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
F16K17/06 (EP);
F16K17/30 (CN);
F16K37/0091 (US);
F16K17/087 (US);
F16K31/363 (CN);
F16K31/365 (CN);
F16K37/0025 (CN);
F16K37/005 (EP);
F16K41/12 (EP);
G01M3/2876 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES FEHLERS IN EINEM GEGENDRUCKAUSGEGLICHENEN ENTLASTUNGSVENTIL | [2024/10] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING FAILURE IN A BACK PRESSURE BALANCED RELIEF VALVE | [2024/10] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE DÉFAILLANCE DANS UNE SOUPAPE DE DÉCHARGE ÉQUILIBRÉE CONTRE LA CONTRE-PRESSION | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/42] | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21727668.2 / EP4143467 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3294114 (BIRKEMEIER HENRY P); | [XI]FR1491463 ; | [XI]GB1446704 (NAT VULCAN ENG INSURANCE GROUP); | [XI]DE2600756 (BOPP & REUTHER GMBH); | [X]EP0096616 (SFR ROBINETTERIE SA [FR]); | [XI]US5711340 (GUSKY FRANK J [US], et al); | [XI]DE102006021235 (GERHARD GOETZE KG [DE]) |