EP4346060 - METHOD AND CHARGING DEVICE FOR PROCESSING AND/OR OUTPUTTING MEASUREMENT DATA OF THE CHARGING DEVICE IN A MANIPULATION-PROOF MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact e-Mobility GmbH Hainbergstrasse 2 32816 Schieder-Schwalenberg / DE | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, Markus 33102 Paderborn / DE | 02 /
Wiesenthal, Thomas 59759 Arnsberg / DE | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Graefe, Karsten Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, Licenses & Standards Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23199682.8 | 26.09.2023 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | BE20220005776 | 29.09.2022 Original published format: BE 202205776 | [2024/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4346060 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, B60L53/60, B60L53/66 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H02J7/00032 (EP);
B60L53/60 (EP);
B60L53/65 (EP);
B60L53/665 (EP);
H02J7/00045 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2024/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND LADEVORRICHTUNG ZUM MANIPULATIONSGESCHÜTZTEN VERARBEITEN UND/ODER AUSGEBEN VON MESSDATEN DER LADEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/14] | English: | METHOD AND CHARGING DEVICE FOR PROCESSING AND/OR OUTPUTTING MEASUREMENT DATA OF THE CHARGING DEVICE IN A MANIPULATION-PROOF MANNER | [2024/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CHARGE POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET/OU L'AFFICHAGE PROTÉGÉ CONTRE LES MANIPULATIONS DE DONNÉES DE MESURE DU DISPOSITIF DE CHARGE | [2024/14] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 05.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010149449 (RWE AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2016098770 (CHANG JEFFREY [US], et al); | [Y]WO2020038903 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US2020162487 (HONG JUNHO [US], et al); | [XYI]CN111332149 (GLOBAL ENERGY INTERCONNECTION RES INST CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | EP3521102 | WO2019233918 | EP3702200 | EP3718814 | WO2021168495 |