EP4339139 - A CROSS-BELT SORTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurosort B.V. De Boomgaard 2 1243 HV 's-Graveland / NL | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALK, Wouter 1396 JK Baambrugge / NL | 02 /
VAN HAASTER, Patrick Theodorus Johannes 2191 AS De Zilk / NL | 03 /
DUIVENVOORDEN, Martinus Fredericus Johannes 2191 BA De Zilk / NL | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 23199862.6 | 18.02.2019 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4339139 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/96, B65G15/44, B65G47/84, // B65G47/82 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B65G47/96 (EP);
B65G47/82 (EP,US);
B65G15/30 (US);
B65G15/44 (EP);
B65G47/844 (EP);
B65G47/962 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | QUERBANDSORTIERER | [2024/12] | English: | A CROSS-BELT SORTER | [2024/12] | French: | TRIEUSE À COURROIES CROISÉES | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 28.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19157749.3 / EP3696122 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1167248 (VANDERLANDE IND NEDERLAND [NL]); | [XA]US2003209405 (GREVE CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al); | [XA]WO2013048245 (VANDERLANDE IND BV [NL]) | by applicant | US2016257501 |