EP4283912 - INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON SWEEPING BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xing Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | 02 /
BI, Feng Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Junfeng Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | 04 /
HAO, Peng Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | 05 /
GAO, Bo Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 23200194.1 | 03.05.2017 | [2023/48] | Priority number, date | CN201610669806 | 12.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610669806 | [2023/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4283912 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4283912 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L5/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0007 (CN);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04L5/0048 (CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN);
H04W72/04 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/48] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] |
Former [2023/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG BASIEREND AUF EINEM SWEEPING-BLOCK | [2023/48] | English: | INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON SWEEPING BLOCK | [2023/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS BASÉS SUR UN BLOC DE BALAYAGE | [2023/48] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17838384.0 / EP3500004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "Support for Beam Based Common Control Plane", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, P.R. China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160513), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165364, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160513), XP051096653 [A] 1-10 * section 2 Frame structure support for beam base common control - section 2.1 Downlink Sweeping for Discovery Signaling * * section 3 Conclusion * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Framework for beamformed access", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160513), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-164013, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160513), XP051090295 [A] 1-10 * section 3 Beam sweeping for beamformed access * * section 5 Conclusions * |