EP4360511 - LAUNDRY HANGER WITH FOLDABLE HANGER ARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINTEC Textilpflegesysteme GMBH Daimlerstraße 7 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ortolf, Heribert 86391 Stadtbergen / DE | 02 /
Köppendörfer, Moritz 86199 Augsburg / DE | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23202043.8 | 06.10.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | DE202210128723 | 28.10.2022 Original published format: DE102022128723 | [2024/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4360511 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A47G25/40, A47G25/48 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A47G25/4023 (EP);
A47G25/48 (EP);
A47G25/483 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBÜGEL MIT KLAPPBAREN BÜGELARMEN | [2024/18] | English: | LAUNDRY HANGER WITH FOLDABLE HANGER ARMS | [2024/18] | French: | CINTRE AVEC BRAS DE REPASSAGE REPLIABLES | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE29507872U (KANNEGIESSER H GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 11,12* figure 2 *; | [A]FR2773449 (ROUCHAVILLE DIDIER [FR]) [A] 1; | [A]FR2775174 (VARRAILLON JEAN [FR]) [A] 1; | [XYI]CN105520488 (JIANGSU SEA-LION MACHINERY GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-10 * [Y] 11,12 [I] 7-10 | by applicant | DE29601670U |