EP4354192 - ROUTING TOOL FOR INSTALLATION OF FIBER OPTIC CABLES AND METHOD OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Research & Development Corporation 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAULKNER, Michael Todd North Carolina, 28603 / US | 02 /
NIELSEN, Lars Kristian North Carolina, 28037 / US | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 23202365.5 | 09.10.2023 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | US202263415771P | 13.10.2022 Original published format: US 202263415771 P | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4354192 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, G02B6/46, H04Q1/06 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
G02B6/475 (EP);
G02B6/54 (US);
G02B6/4457 (EP);
G02B6/4459 (EP);
H04Q1/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROUTINGWERKZEUG ZUR INSTALLATION VON GLASFASERKABELN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/16] | English: | ROUTING TOOL FOR INSTALLATION OF FIBER OPTIC CABLES AND METHOD OF USING SAME | [2024/16] | French: | OUTIL DE ROUTAGE POUR L'INSTALLATION DE CÂBLES À FIBRES OPTIQUES ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011249949 (GRIFFITHS IAN [IT], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]US2020358277 (KEWITSCH ANTHONY STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038]; figures 6-16 *; | [XAI]WO2021247709 (COMMSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10,13-15 * page 16 - page 18; figures 2, 3, 13, 18-21 * [A] 4-8,12 [I] 3,11 |