EP4358132 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH THERMAL DISSIPATION AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guo, Zhan-Ying 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Liao, Yi-Tien 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Lai, Sam 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23202479.4 | 09.10.2023 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | US202218047670 | 19.10.2022 Original published format: US202218047670 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4358132 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4358132 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, H01L23/31 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H01L23/49513 (EP,US);
H01L21/50 (CN);
H01L21/4853 (US);
H01L21/4871 (US);
H01L21/4889 (US);
H01L21/56 (CN,US);
H01L23/3107 (EP,CN);
H01L23/3157 (US);
H01L23/36 (US);
H01L23/367 (CN);
H01L23/49503 (CN);
H01L23/4952 (EP,US);
H01L23/49838 (US);
H01L24/06 (US);
H01L24/48 (US);
H01L24/85 (CN);
H01L2224/0401 (US);
H01L2224/04042 (US);
H01L2224/48091 (US);
H01L2224/48149 (US);
H01L2224/85 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERANORDNUNG MIT THERMISCHER ABLEITUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/17] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH THERMAL DISSIPATION AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2024/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR À DISSIPATION THERMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2024/17] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6198171 (HUANG CHIEN-PING [TW], et al); | [Y]US2005040501 (HAGEN DEBORAH A [US]); | [IA]US7064009 (MCCANN DAVID R [US], et al); | [IY]US2006192295 (LEE JAE S [KR], et al) |