EP4354039 - ACTUATOR OF HVAC UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Tyco IP Holdings LLP 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOVATI, Mattia 20031 Cesate, Milano / IT | 02 /
CAROZZI, Michele 23871 Lomagna, Lecco / IT | 03 /
VISCARDI, Claudio 23880 Casatenovo, Lecco / IT | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Nürnberg Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/16] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 23202976.9 | 11.10.2023 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | US202263414960P | 11.10.2022 Original published format: US 202263414960 P | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4354039 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14, G05G1/02, G05G1/08, F16K37/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
F24F13/1426 (EP);
F24F11/74 (US);
F16K31/041 (EP);
F16K37/0033 (EP);
F16K37/0041 (EP);
G05G1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTUATOR FÜR HVAC-EINHEIT | [2024/16] | English: | ACTUATOR OF HVAC UNIT | [2024/16] | French: | ACTIONNEUR D'UNITÉ CVC | [2024/16] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3173705 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2019277532 (JENKS RUSSELL T [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020182504 (MIKULICA MIROSLAV [CZ], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2020408435 (JENKS RUSSELL T [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |