EP4285766 - SOLE STRUCTURE OF AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILLY, Devin Beaverton, Oregon, 97005 / US | 02 /
FLANAGAN, Wade Beaverton, Oregon, 97005 / US | 03 /
SCHINDLER, Eric S. Beaverton, Oregon, 97005 / US | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23203284.7 | 27.03.2020 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | US201962825339P | 28.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962825339 P | US202016825294 | 20.03.2020 Original published format: US202016825294 | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4285766 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4285766 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/12, A43B13/18, A43B13/20, A43B1/00, A43B7/14, A43B3/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A43B13/125 (EP);
A43B13/189 (EP,US);
A43B1/0072 (EP);
A43B13/186 (EP);
A43B13/20 (EP);
A43B21/265 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | A43B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2023/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SOHLENSTRUKTUR EINES SCHUHWERKS | [2023/49] | English: | SOLE STRUCTURE OF AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR | [2023/49] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SEMELLE D'UN ARTICLE CHAUSSANT | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 28.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20721018.8 / EP3945922 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010170109 (SCHINDLER ERIC S [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10,12 * figures 1, 10-13 * * paragraph [0038] * [I] 11; | [XI]US2010192409 (SCHINDLER ERIC S [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12 * the whole document * [I] 11; | [A]CN104273791 (QIAODAN SPORTS CO LTD) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XI]US2016021974 (SCHINDLER ERIC S [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10,12 * figures 1,4,5,7-9,11 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086] * [I] 11 |