EP4282311 - DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2100 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCACHREN, Brian C. Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 02 /
THOMSON, Andrew J. Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 23203915.6 | 27.09.2017 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4282311 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4282311 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/38 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A47K10/3827 (EP);
A47K10/38 (KR,US);
A47K2010/3233 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00837 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | SPENDER | [2023/48] | English: | DISPENSER | [2023/48] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR | [2023/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17926794.3 / EP3687356 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3171288U (YUKI IIZUKA) [A] 1-4,7-10 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2016338554 (MARUYAMA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2,10* paragraph [0024] * | by applicant | - "Multifunctional surfaces produced by femtosecond laser pulses", Journal of Applied Physics, (20150000), vol. 117, page 033103 |