EP4328087 - LOAD HANDLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hiab AB Hyllie Vattenparksgata 12 215 32 Malmö / SE | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/09] | For all designated states Hiab AB c/o Cargotec Sweden AB Box 1133 164 22 Kista / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VÄHÄ-PIIKKIÖ, Ville FI-21290 Rusko / FI | 02 /
MATTILA, Tommi FI-21530 Paimio / FI | 03 /
SIRÉN, Pasi FI-21610 Kirjala / FI | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Bjerkén Hynell KB P.O. Box 1061 101 39 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/09] | Bjerkén Hynell KB Tulegatan 53 113 53 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 23204622.7 | 19.10.2023 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4328087 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/48, B60P1/64 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B60P1/6463 (EP);
B60P1/649 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2024/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASTHANDHABUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/09] | English: | LOAD HANDLING SYSTEM | [2024/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MANUTENTION DE CHARGE | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0925999 (PARTEK CARGOTEC LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0029] - [0036] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]FR2940937 (GUIMA PALFINGER [FR]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 9 - page 6, line 6 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP3141421 (DENNISON TRAILERS UNLIMITED COMPANY [IE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 39] ** figures 14, 15 * | by applicant | EP1288067 | DE102015113283 | EP3141421 |