EP4369108 - FIXING DEVICE AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS INCORPORATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwami, Shuntaroh Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 23204894.2 | 20.10.2023 | [2024/20] | Priority number, date | JP20220180934 | 11.11.2022 Original published format: JP 2022180934 | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4369108 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
G03G15/2017 (EP);
G03G15/2025 (EP,US);
G03G15/2053 (EP);
G03G15/2064 (US);
G03G2215/2038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FIXIERVORRICHTUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2024/20] | English: | FIXING DEVICE AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS INCORPORATING THE SAME | [2024/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES L'INCORPORANT | [2024/20] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2010139642 (CANON KK); | [XA]JP2014174488 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]US2017160683 (GON SHOKO [JP]) | by applicant | JP2014174488 |